ABINGDON CONCERT BAND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Community wind band which rehearses weekly and regularly performs at concerts and other events in and around Abingdon pn Thames in Oxfordshire.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 31 October 2001: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Cate Beavis | Chair | 16 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
Devika Arvind Pandit | Trustee | 05 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Anastasi | Trustee | 05 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Crosbie | Trustee | 07 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Shepherd | Trustee | 15 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Caitlin Kettlewell | Trustee | 15 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Brownless | Trustee | 24 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
KATHRYN WILCOX | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.52k | £8.63k | £2.65k | £8.23k | £18.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.21k | £7.39k | £4.75k | £8.11k | £15.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £400 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 15 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 02 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 17 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 06 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 10 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION DATED 27 SEPTEMBER 2001 AS AMENDED 3 OCTOBER 2002
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE BAND IS TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF MEMBERS AND OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC BY MEANS OF THE REHEARSAL AND PRESENTATION OF CONCERTS AND LIKE ACTIVITIES OF EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE NATURE.
Area of benefit
MEMBERS (OF THE ABINGDON CONERT BAND) AND OF THE PUBLIC
Contact information
- Address:
-
20 Balliol Drive
DIDCOT
Oxfordshire
OX11 9RJ
- Phone:
- 07527783520
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window