Trustees ABINGDON CONCERT BAND
Charity number: 1089143

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Cate Beavis | Chair | 16 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
Devika Arvind Pandit | Trustee | 05 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Anastasi | Trustee | 05 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Crosbie | Trustee | 07 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Shepherd | Trustee | 15 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Caitlin Kettlewell | Trustee | 15 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Brownless | Trustee | 24 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
KATHRYN WILCOX | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.