Financial history HYTHE 2000 CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity Number: 1095039
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £1.60k £3.85k £5.06k £6.47k £6.15k
Total expenditure £4.10k £1.66k £7.46k £6.59k £5.30k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A