Financial history FRIENDS OF MULANJE ORPHANS

Charity number: 1090727
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/09/2020 01/09/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £104.37k £44.75k £39.63k £88.73k £63.20k
Total expenditure £73.33k £53.57k £48.45k £76.25k £74.82k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A