REAL AID

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance education worldwide and for the public benefit to relieve persons and in particular children who are suffering sickness, need, hardship or distress anywhere in the world as a result of famine, drought, flood, war or any other calamity.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
- Kingston Upon Hull City
- Bulgaria
- Moldova
- Netherlands
- Romania
Governance
- 13 November 2001: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BARBARA RAINE | Trustee | 26 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
SAMUEL HART | Trustee | 01 August 2014 |
|
|
||||
JONATHAN RAINE | Trustee | 01 August 2014 |
|
|
||||
MONA TUCKER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £319.00k | £335.09k | £304.46k | £304.63k | £345.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £317.00k | £285.76k | £286.96k | £287.41k | £339.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £13.95k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 21 June 2024 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 21 June 2024 | 21 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 27 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 27 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 04 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 04 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 23 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 23 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 29 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 29 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 2 JULY 2001
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION WORLDWIDE AND FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO RELIEVE PERSONS AND IN PARTICULAR CHILDREN WHO ARE SUFFERING SICKNESS, NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD AS A RESULT OF FAMINE, DROUGHT, FLOOD, WAR OR ANY OTHER CALAMITY
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
UNITS 4-6
RIVERSIDE WORKS
HULL BRIDGE ROAD
BEVERLEY
NORTH HUMBERSIDE
HU17 9RT
- Phone:
- 01482880660
- Email:
- admin@realaid.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window