THE JOURNEY OF A LIFETIME TRUST (JOLT)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
JoLt was set up in 1983 and is run on a totally voluntary basis. Every 2 years, JoLt organises expeditions all over the world for groups of young people (from 14 to 21 years) with significant disadvantages (they are disabled or ill, or have been neglected or abused). These are tiring, taxing but hugely rewarding journeys. Each young person is expected to fundraise; donations make up the balance.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 26 September 2001: Standard registration
- JOLT (Working name)
- THE JOLT TRUST (JOURNEY OF A LIFETIME) (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SIMON GRUSELLE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Annabel Natalie Asole | Trustee | 07 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Natasha Ingrid Davies | Trustee | 07 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
EMMA RIDGEON | Trustee | 28 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
Dr OLIVIA HUSSEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £42.18k | £10.06k | £9.41k | £9.10k | £9.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.18k | £3.49k | £3.81k | £6.87k | £46.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 14 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 08 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 08 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 18/06/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05/04/2007 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 10/08/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13/10/2011
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE COMPANY IS ESTABLISHED ARE TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PERSONS BETWEEN THE AGES OF FOURTEEN AND TWENTY-ONE YEARS BY THE PROVISION OF JOURNEYS, EXPEDITIONS AND HOLIDAYS IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE TO PROVIDE THESE FACILITIES FOR YOUNG PERSONS WHO WOULD BENEFIT BY REASON OF THEIR DISABILITY, POVERTY OR SOCIAL OR ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES SO AS TO IMPROVE THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE OLD FORGE
THE STREET
CHIPPERFIELD
KINGS LANGLEY
WD4 9BH
- Phone:
- 01923262185
- Email:
- simon@jolttrust.org.uk
- Website:
-
jolttrust.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window