PRIORY PUMA'S FOOTBALL CLUB
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2004
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Dudley
Governance
- 21 February 2002: Standard registration
- 09 May 2010: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2004 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2005 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 4 JULY 1996 AS AMENDED 12 JULY 2001 AND 31 OCTOBER 2001
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN BETWEEN THE AGES OF 5 AND 16 YEARS RESIDING IN DUDLEY AND SURROUNDING AREAS BY PROVIDING FACILITIES AND OPPORTUNITIES FOR PLAYING FOOTBALL AND OTHER RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES SO AS TO PROMOTE AND ENCOURAGE THE PHYSICAL DEVELOPMENT OF SUCH CHILDREN
Area of benefit
DUDLEY AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window