THE LONDON CENTRE FOR SPIRITUAL DIRECTION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The London Centre for Spirituality is a resourse for prayer, exploration, training and development and aims to provide a Christian response to the contemporary thirst for meaning and purpose.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout London
Governance
- 20 December 2001: Standard registration
- THE LONDON CENTRE FOR SPIRITUALITY (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Karen Wellman | Chair | 08 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev Jack Noble | Trustee | 17 April 2023 | ||||||
The Venerable Catherine Ruth Pickford | Trustee | 06 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW JOHN CORNISH | Trustee | 24 February 2022 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £147.69k | £73.23k | £97.81k | £115.84k | £114.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £159.75k | £76.45k | £111.87k | £111.05k | £131.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 06 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 06 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 10 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 10 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 22 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 22 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 02 July 2021 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 02 July 2021 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 22 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 22 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 02 JUL 2001 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 06 APR 2017
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE SPIRITUALITY BY ACTING AS A CHRISTIAN RESOURCE FOR PRAYER, EXPLORATION, TRAINING AND DEVELOPMENT .
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
BSR Bespoke Chartered Accountants
Linden House
6 Linden Close
Eridge Road
TUNBRIDGE WELLS
Kent
- Phone:
- 01892514514
- Email:
- info@lcsd.org.uk
- Website:
-
WWW.LCSD.ORG.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window