AFRICA CHILDREN'S FUND-UK
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Africa Children's Fund-UK works with children and women in some of Africa's poorest communities. We empower women and girls with life skills and help them to set up income generating projects. We also help HIV/AIDS with school fees and also run feeding programmes in selected schools.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 January 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- South Africa
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 08 June 2006: Standard registration
- 12 May 2015: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- AFRICEF (Working name)
- MASAKHANE TRUST (Working name)
- AFRICA CHILDREN'S FUND - UK LIMITED (Previous name)
- KIDS AFRICA LIMITED (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/01/2010 | 30/01/2011 | 30/01/2012 | 30/01/2013 | 30/01/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.00k | £23.90k | £19.87k | £24.19k | £14.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.80k | £20.15k | £19.80k | £24.09k | £14.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 January 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 January 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 January 2014 | 02 February 2015 | 64 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 January 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 January 2013 | 23 January 2014 | 54 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 January 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 January 2012 | 21 November 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 January 2012 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 18/10/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21/05/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09/06/2006 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 31/03/2011 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 09/01/2012
Charitable objects
(I) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS. (II) THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF HEALTH. (III) THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING CHILDREN'S CONDITIONS OF LIFE. (IV) THE SUPPORT OF RESEARCH INTO THE CAUSES AND EFFECTS OF CHILD HOMELESSNESS AND TO DISSEMINATE THE USEFUL RESULTS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT. (V) THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN UNDERSTANDING CRIME AND DRUGS AND TO ASSIST YOUNG PEOPLE NOT TO TAKE UP CRIMINAL ACTIVITY OR TO GIVE UP SUCH ACTIVITY IF THEY HAVE DONE SO. (VI) SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE. THE BENEFICIARIES OF THE CHARITY SHALL BE CHILDREN, PARTICULARLY THOSE WHO ARE ORPHANED, HOMELESS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ABROAD, CHILDREN OF FAILED ASYLUM SEEKERS OR CHILDREN WHO HAVE RECENTLY ARRIVED IN THE UNITED KINGDOM TO LIVE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window