Governing document CORNWALL NEIGHBOURHOODS FOR CHANGE LIMITED

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 04/06/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27/11/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21/07/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19/07/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 06/07/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19/12/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24/02/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07/04/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22/11/2011
Charitable objects
(1) THE RELIEF OF PERSONS IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES, THE AGED, DISABLED, HANDICAPPED, AND CHRONICALLY SICK. (2) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY. (3) THE DEVELOPMENT OF THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF THE MEMBERS OF THE SOCIALLY AND/OR ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES OF CORNWALL IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY, AND HELP MEET, THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY. (4) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL OR OTHER LEISURE TIME FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR PERSONS IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES, THE AGED, DISABLED, HANDICAPPED AND CHRONICALLY SICK AND WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES. (5) THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE OCCUPATION FOR COMMUNITIES IN CORNWALL IN THE INTERESTS OF THEIR SOCIAL WELFARE WITHIN THE MEANING OF THE RECREATIONAL CHARITIES ACT 1958 AND AS LIMITED IN THAT ACT (6) THE RELIEF FOR UNEMPLOYMENT OF THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN SUCH WAYS AS MAY BE THOUGHT FIT, INCLUDING ASSISTANCE TO FIND EMPLOYMENT .
Area of benefit
CORNWALL.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.