METABOLIC SUPPORT UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide Metabolic disease information, support and services to our service users that meet their immediate specific need, to undertake educational services, lobby on their behalf and research disease specific information to satisfy medium term needs and to support world class research into metabolic diseases to meet the long term needs. We operate worldwide.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
56 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£70k to £80k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 30 November 2001: Standard registration
- CLIMB (Working name)
- THE NATIONAL INFORMATION CENTRE FOR METABOLIC DISEASES (Working name)
- CHILDREN LIVING WITH INHERITED METABOLIC DISEASES (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Scott Mason | Trustee | 09 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Reena Sharma | Trustee | 18 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rosie Lindup | Trustee | 04 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Adrien Felix Lemoine | Trustee | 04 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Astley Cox | Trustee | 04 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carl Lander | Trustee | 02 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Roshni Samji Vara | Trustee | 27 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr ROBERT ERIC PUGH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PAUL ROPER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £365.31k | £489.46k | £254.28k | £272.42k | £228.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £509.06k | £400.32k | £227.26k | £287.05k | £374.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £27.61k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 March 2023 | 59 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 March 2023 | 59 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 21 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 09/08/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27/11/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18/03/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29/01/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02/10/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03/03/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11/01/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 08 MAY 2018
Charitable objects
A) THE RELIEF OF CHILDREN, YOUNG ADULTS, FAMILY MEMBERS AND CARERS AFFECTED BY METABOLIC DISEASES IN PARTICULAR BY MEANS OF: I) PROVIDING, FOR THE SAME GROUP, AN INFORMATION, ADVICE, AND SUPPORT SERVICE. II) PUTTING, THE SAME GROUP, INTO CONTACT WITH EACH OTHER FOR THEIR MUTUAL BENEFIT, HELP AND SUPPORT. III) THE PROVISION FOR GRANTS AND ALLOWANCES, FOR THE SAME GROUP, AND IN ADDITION TO HOSPITALS, HOMES OR INSTITUTIONS, AS SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED, FOR THE PURPOSES OF MEDICAL TREATMENT, CARE AND RELIEF FROM SUFFERING. B) THE RELIEF OF ADULTS WHO ARE AFFECTED BY METABOLIC DISEASES BY THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT AND SERVICES WHICH ARE NOT OTHERWISE PROVIDED BY ANY OTHER METABOLIC DISEASE GROUP IN ENGLAND AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT. C)THE EDUCATION OF HEALTH CARE PROFESSIONALS, OTHER PROFESSIONALS AND THE GENERAL PUBLIC ABOUT METABOLIC DISEASES. D)TO PROVIDE MEDICAL RESEARCH INTO METABOLIC DISEASE AND THEIR DIAGNOSIS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Metabolic Support UK
Centurion House
129 Deansgate
MANCHESTER
M3 3WR
- Phone:
- 01244207581
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window