ORMESBY VILLAGE CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a small village community centre, providing a meeting place for local clubs and societies, a venue for private hire for members of the community, and we also act as a polling station during national and local elections.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Norfolk
Governance
- 18 December 2001: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN GINGELL | Trustee | 04 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ormesby St Margaret With Scratby And California Parish Council | Trustee | 03 November 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.14k | £15.11k | £406 | £8.19k | £7.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.86k | £5.12k | £5.14k | £2.62k | £9.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 16 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 27 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 15 January 2023 | 199 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 25 March 2022 | 268 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 03 August 2020 | 34 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14TH NOVEMBER 2001
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE TO BENEFIT THE INHABITANTS OF THE VILLAGE OF ORMESBY ST MARGARET, NORFOLK WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINION BY PROVIDING AND MAINTAINING IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND TO IMPROVE THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS A VILLAGE CENTRE FOR USE BY THE INHABITANTS (1) FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES AND (11) FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION.
Area of benefit
THE VILLAGE OF ORMESBY ST MARGARET
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Village Centre
Station Road
Ormesby St Margaret
GREAT YARMOUTH
Norfolk
NR29 3PU
- Phone:
- 07825266117
- Email:
- vcormesby@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window