Financial history DENE VALLEY COMMUNITY TRANSPORT LTD

Charity number: 1090747
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £115.38k £77.02k £64.94k £56.51k £49.81k
Total expenditure £135.53k £105.33k £90.50k £90.37k £54.65k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £21.63k N/A £26.41k £2.19k N/A