DENE VALLEY COMMUNITY TRANSPORT LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity's main activity is to provide a Community Transport service in the Dene Valley and surrounding areas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Durham
Governance
- 21 February 2002: Standard registration
- DENE VALLEY COMMUNITY TRANSPORT ASSOCIATION (Working name)
- DENE VALLEY COMMUNITY TRANSPORT LIMITED (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANTHONY HOPKINSON BIRD | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Allan Stokoe | Trustee | 30 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Frederick Baxter Pine | Trustee | 30 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Clark | Trustee | 30 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Thomas Briggs | Trustee | 30 September 2016 |
|
|||||
JANICE CLARK | Trustee | 18 December 2013 |
|
|||||
WINIFRED DINES | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £115.38k | £77.02k | £64.94k | £56.51k | £49.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £135.53k | £105.33k | £90.50k | £90.37k | £54.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £21.63k | N/A | £26.41k | £2.19k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 March 2022 | 46 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 12 May 2022 | 101 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 01 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 10 DECEMBER 1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 29 JANUARY 2002
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE COMPANY IS TO PROVIDE A COMMUNITY TRANSPORT SERVICE FOR SUCH OF THE INHABITANTS OF DENE VALLEY AND ITS NEIGHBOURHOOD WHO ARE IN NEED OF SUCH A SERVICE BECAUSE OF AGE, SICKNESS OR DISABILITY (MENTAL OR PHYSICAL), OR POVERTY, OR BECAUSE OF A LACK OF AVAILABILITY OF ADEQUATE AND SAFE PUBLIC PASSENGER SERVICES.
Area of benefit
DENE VALLEY AND ITS NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
One Stop Shop
High Street
Eldon Lane
Bishop Auckland
DL14 8TD
- Phone:
- 01388417740
- Email:
- denevalley@hotmail.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window