Financial history UNION GROVE COMMUNITY NURSERY LAMBETH

Charity Number: 1094416
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £531.22k £367.94k £312.43k £394.99k £450.16k
Total expenditure £465.21k £360.80k £285.10k £369.03k £435.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £236.55k £204.81k £104.99k N/A £135.26k
Income - Donations and legacies £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £531.22k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £465.21k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A