Financial history NATIONAL HIV NURSES ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1099074
Charity reporting is up to date (187 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £179.76k £38.54k £86.37k £135.19k £145.08k
Total expenditure £183.35k £83.00k £82.39k £158.80k £149.32k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A