Governing document NATIONAL HIV NURSES ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 1099074

Charity reporting is up to date (187 days late)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12/05/1998 29.6.2000, 27.06.2002, 26.06.2003, 17/06/2011
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AMONGST MEMBERS OF THE NURSING PROFESSION ABOUT GOOD NURSING PRACTICES AND TO PROMOTE IMPROVED STANDARDS OF NURSING CARE OF PATIENTS WITH HIV. TO PROMOTE RESEARCH INTO THE PROMOTION OF HIV NURSING SKILLS AND TO PUBLISH THE RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.