Trustees NATIONAL HIV NURSES ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 1099074

Charity reporting is up to date (187 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LINDA PANTON | Chair | 24 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Hodgson | Trustee | 24 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Darran McAteer | Trustee | 12 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Laura Hilton | Trustee | 12 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sian Jeffery | Trustee | 15 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mandla Moses Shongwe | Trustee | 15 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen Elizabeth Reynolds | Trustee | 17 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Colaco Osorio | Trustee | 16 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Mcluskey | Trustee | 17 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Kendrick | Trustee | 17 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Daini Flower | Trustee | 28 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Garry Brough | Trustee | 28 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
MR ANDY MARSHALL | Trustee | 19 June 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.