VETERINARY WOUND HEALING ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1090458
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To promote education and research into the scientific basis and the clinical management of wounds of whatever aetiology in the veterinary sciences. To establish training courses together with national and international conferences to discuss and promote aspects of wound healing research.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £6,174
Total expenditure: £3,899

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Animals
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England
  • Germany
  • Netherlands
  • Sweden

Governance

Registration history:
  • 06 February 2002: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr JACINTHA WILMINK Chair
None on record
Dr Piotr Bobrowski Trustee 02 May 2024
None on record
Dr Neeltje Deetman-Drijfhout Trustee 02 May 2024
None on record
Dr MICHAEL BRAUN Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £3.50k £3.64k £11.06k £14.13k £6.17k
Total expenditure £188 £5.64k £17.88k £12.62k £3.90k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 13 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 22 April 2024 174 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 31 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2020 30 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2019 07 January 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Saxtorphsvej 26
DK-2500 Valby
Denmark
Phone:
+4529467584