AL- RAZA FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE OBJECTIVES OF THE ASSOCIATION SHALL BE TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF GREATER MANCHESTER AND IN PARTICULAR THOSE OF THE SHI'ITE MUSLIMS IN A MANNER CONSISTENT WITH THE TEACHINGS AND TRADITIONS OF THE SHI'ITE FAITH (FIQUA JAFARIA0 WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL OR OTHER OPINION.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Manchester City
Governance
- 21 November 2001: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr SYED AKBAR MEHDI RIZVI | Chair | 02 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
SYED SAJJAD HUSSAIN ZAIDI | Trustee | 02 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
SYED SOHAIL JAFRI | Trustee | 02 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
SYED HASAN RAZA NAQVI BSC, MBA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.57k | £10.35k | £42.15k | £39.02k | £37.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.08k | £8.76k | £16.89k | £44.08k | £82.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 14 December 2023 | 44 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 14 December 2023 | 44 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 November 2023 | 382 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 17 November 2023 | 382 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 April 2022 | 178 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 April 2022 | 543 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18 NOVEMBER 2001 AS AMENDED 4 APRIL 2002
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTIVES OF THE ASSOCIATION SHALL BE TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF GREATER MANCHESTER AND IN PARTICULAR THOSE OF THE SHI'ITE MUSLIMS IN A MANNER CONSISTENT WITH THE TEACHINGS AND TRADITIONS OF THE SHI'ITE FAITH (FIQUA JAFARIA0 WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL OR OTHER OPINION BY THE FOLLOWING: 2.1 PROVIDING FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR THE RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF SUCH INHABITANTS WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. 2.2 PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR RELIGIOUS FUNCTIONS AND THE PERFORMING OF RELIGIOUS RIGHTS AND CEREMONIES IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE SHI'ITE FAITH INCLUDING MARRIAGES AND FUNERALS. 2.3 ADVANCING EDUCATION CONCERNING THE MUSLIM RELIGION AND CULTURE. 2.4 ESTABLISHING OR SECURING THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A CENTRE AND MANAGING OR CO-OPERATING WITH ANY LOCAL STATUTORY AUTHORITY OR ORGANISATION IN THE MAINTENANCE OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE ASSOCIATION IN ENHANCEMENT OF THE ABOVE OBJECTIVES
Area of benefit
GREATER MANCHESTER
Contact information
- Address:
-
AL RAZA FOUNDATION
8-16 PARK GROVE
MANCHESTER
M19 3AQ
- Phone:
- 07766135328
- Email:
- ALRAZAFOUNDATION@GMAIL.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window