FRIENDS OF SUGAR MILL PONDS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To bring together all users of and others interested in the Sugar Mill Ponds site, to discuss all aspects of its management and development as outlined in the site management plan. To help promote, protect and develop a balance between the recreational interests and ecological values of the site. To promote the use of the site by the wider community, schools, local groups etc.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
Governance
- 15 May 2002: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Sherburn | Chair | 27 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
Andrew David Jaques | Trustee | 09 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Clark | Trustee | 18 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Roy Dresser | Trustee | 28 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
Christine Keyes | Trustee | 23 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Vallance | Trustee | 23 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
Raymond Vallance | Trustee | 23 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Harvey | Trustee | 17 August 2008 |
|
|||||
BARBARA WHITEHEAD | Trustee | 01 April 1999 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.79k | £16.69k | £5.20k | £7.47k | £9.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.57k | £3.79k | £5.50k | £14.53k | £6.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 25 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 August 2024 | 201 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 February 2021 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 19 JULY 2001 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 20 MARCH 2002.
Charitable objects
1) PROTECTING AND PRESERVING FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE TOWNSPEOPLE OF THE PARISH OF RAWCLIFFE BRIDGE IN THE EAST RIDING OF YORKSHIRE AND THE NATION AT LARGE THE LAND. 2) MAINTAINING THE LAND FOR SUCH PERSONS FOR RECREATIONAL PURPOSES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. 3) EDUCATING SUCH PERSONS SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR UNDERSTANDING OF ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION, CONSERVATION, NATURE, WILDLIFE AND LAND MANAGEMENT.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF RAWCLIFFE
Contact information
- Address:
-
21 Gossips Wood Road
Rawcliffe Bridge
Goole
DN14 8PE
- Phone:
- 07885733747
- Email:
- friendsofsmp@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window