Financial history JUMPING THROUGH HOOPS LIMITED

Charity number: 1092621
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015
Total gross income £1.02m £1.04m £1.40m £382.33k £14.10k
Total expenditure £941.76k £943.86k £966.88k £691.50k £32.26k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £1.35k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Donations and legacies £8.20k £6.99k £7.66k N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £971.64k £1.00m £1.37m N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Investment £40.62k £34.03k £26.92k N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £931.20k £935.02k £955.68k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £10.56k £8.85k £11.20k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A