Accounts and annual returns RIGHT START

Charity number: 1089243
Charity reporting is overdue by 461 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 95 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 95 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 461 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 461 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 11 March 2023 39 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 20 April 2022 79 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 20 April 2022 444 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required