BETHESDA FOUNDATION LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Bethesda Foundation fosters personal development and income generation through the arts. It re-introduces local indigenous people to their (now extinct) /Xam heritage and contributes to South african history by exploring San mythology in contemporary quilts and prints which are sold to museums and corporations. The Bethesda Arts Centre's work includes poverty relief, social and health issues.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Haringey
- South Africa
Governance
- 30 October 2001: Standard registration
- BETHESDA FOUNDATION (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anne Greene | Trustee | 03 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR JOAN RAPHAEL-LEFF | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
VALERIE ELAINE SINASON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £106.66k | £103.89k | £99.54k | £113.59k | £107.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £100.99k | £101.30k | £115.24k | £90.91k | £59.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 21 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 March 2023 | 59 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 March 2023 | 59 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 24 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 February 2021 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 09 February 2021 | 9 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 5TH JULY 1999, AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 19TH OCTOBER 2001
Charitable objects
THE COMPANY'S OBJECTS ARE FOR THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF PUBLIC HEALTH IN SOUTH AFRICA BY THE PROVISION OF A CENTRE IN NIEU BETHESDA CONTAINING ARTS AND OTHER FACILITIES, AND IN SUCH WAYS AS THE COMPANY MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE.
Area of benefit
SOUTH AFRICA
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O HILTON CONSULTING LTD
STUDIO 133 CANALOT STUDIOS
222 KENSAL ROAD
LONDON
W10 5BN
- Phone:
- 07771317036
- Email:
- info@bethesdafoundation.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window