Accounts and annual returns ENVIRONMENTAL ANIMAL SANCTUARY AND EDUCATION

Charity Number: 1089160
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2024 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2024 Not submitted
Annual return 31 January 2023 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2023 Not submitted
Annual return 31 January 2022 25 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2021 07 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2020 21 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 Not Required