HALESFIELD DAY NURSERY CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the charity are to provide care and advance the education of children.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £168,304 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Telford & Wrekin
Governance
- 18 November 2002: Standard registration
- HALESFIELD DAY NURSERY SUTTON HILL DAY NURSERY (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ADRIAN JONES | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Victoria Aston-Hicks | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Marcelle Kite | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|||||
Claire Dinwiddy | Trustee | 01 October 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £307.85k | £331.97k | £363.01k | £339.37k | £440.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £276.66k | £302.72k | £340.01k | £352.93k | £389.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £130.01k | £1.00k | £159.86k | £143.68k | £168.30k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 05 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 February 2021 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2020
(These accounts |
05 February 2021 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 25 FEBRUARY 1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 11 JUNE 2002 AND 7 AUGUST 2002.
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE CARE AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Halesfield Day Nursery Centre
Unit J
Halesfield 22
TELFORD
TF7 4QX
- Phone:
- 01952 583848
- Website:
-
telfordnurseries.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window