Financial history THE SEHGAL CHARITABLE TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 1096767
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £418 £161 £4 £1.09k £2.91k
Total expenditure £1.35k £1.06k £1.46k £3.71k £1.44k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A