Accounts and annual returns HUMBLE HEART CHURCH OF GOD

Charity number: 1102287
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 8 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 8 days
Annual return 30 June 2023 08 April 2025 343 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2022 15 July 2023 76 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 15 July 2023 441 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 19 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required