HUMBLE HEART CHURCH OF GOD

Charity number: 1102287
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

provide christian teaching in the u.k, Jamaica & South Africa. Give moral advice & support to those in need. Support our own charity & other charities financially by holding fund raising events. Support needy causes by providing materialistic items. In process of building a Church in South Africa on land gifted by an individual member of the church.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2023

Total income: £9,482
Total expenditure: £3,438

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
  • Religious Activities
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Enfield
  • Hackney
  • Waltham Forest
  • Jamaica
  • South Africa

Governance

Registration history:
  • 24 February 2004: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
CASMIN MAY ALLISON Trustee
None on record
Trevor Gray Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023
Total gross income £6.25k £3.33k £0 £8.90k £9.48k
Total expenditure £6.45k £7.31k £0 £4.13k £3.44k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 6 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 6 days
Annual return 30 June 2023 08 April 2025 343 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2022 15 July 2023 76 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 15 July 2023 441 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 19 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
32 Myddelton Avenue
ENFIELD
EN1 4AE
Phone:
07791832595
Website:

No information available