Financial history SHAH PORAN ISLAMIC JAMI MOSQUE AND COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity number: 1093509
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £44.29k £12.88k £18.26k £22.24k £45.10k
Total expenditure £43.46k £7.41k £25.62k £21.42k £22.40k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A