Christian Science Society, Harrogate

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our church is in the process of disbanding, and is no longer holding public services or operating a reading room open to the public. We are continuing at present with our donations to Christian Science nursing homes and local churches, and local charities. following Charity Commission guidelines on the disbursement of our funds.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 15 February 2002: Standard registration
- FIRST CHURCH OF CHRIST, SCIENTIST, HARROGATE (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN ROSS PATERSON | Trustee | 01 February 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.58k | £9.35k | £4.64k | £330 | £400 | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.45k | £177.58k | £126.98k | £136.30k | £515.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 25 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 25 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
BY-LAWS ADOPTED 29 SEPTEMBER 1910 AS AMENDED 30 JULY 2001 as amended on 02 Jul 2018 as amended on 01 Jul 2019
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE TRUTHS OF THE BIBLE AS EXPLAINED THROUGH THE WRITINGS OF MARY BAKER EDDY AND TO PROMOTE THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CAUSE OF CHRISTIAN SCIENCE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- 15 February 2002 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 BIRKDALE AVENUE
KNARESBOROUGH
HG5 0LS
- Phone:
- 01423866465
- Email:
- JOHNROSSPATERSON@GMAIL.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window