UPPERTHORPE & NETHERTHORPE HEALTHY LIVING CENTRE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of health, recreation, leisure and educational opportunities, particularly in the Netherthorpe, Upperthorpe and Langsett areas of Sheffield.. The key focus of provision is the Zest Centre - a healthy living centre comprising a public swimming pool, gym, library, cafe, meeting rooms, office space and a range of health promotion and public health initiatives.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £80,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 31 January 2002: Standard registration
- UPPERTHORPE HLC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kelly Daubney | Trustee | 04 December 2023 |
|
|||||
Adam Michael Douglas | Trustee | 04 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Laura McCLean | Trustee | 19 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Charlotte Smith | Trustee | 28 February 2023 |
|
|||||
Matthew Dean | Trustee | 25 July 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £80.00k | £80.00k | £80.00k | £80.00k | £80.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £176.38k | £175.77k | £175.77k | £174.42k | £175.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | £80.00k | £80.00k | £80.00k | £80.00k | £80.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 19 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 24 JULY 2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 6 DECEMBER 2001.
Charitable objects
1) TO PROMOTE THE GOOD HEALTH AND WELLBEING OF THE COMMUNITY IN THE LANGSETT NETHERTHORPE AREAS OF SHEFFIELD AND IN PARTICULAR BY THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A HEALTHY LIVING CENTRE IN THE AREA. 2) TO PROVIDE OF ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES IN THE AREA IN ORDER TO PROMOTE AND DEVELOP THE EDUCATION AND PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF THOSE PERSONS USING THEM WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
LANGSETT NETHERTHORPE AND UPPERTHORPE
Contact information
- Address:
-
ZEST
18 UPPERTHORPE
SHEFFIELD
S6 3NA
- Phone:
- 0114 2702041
- Email:
- info@zestcommunity.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window