Financial history ACTION ON PAIN

Charity number: 1088789
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £3.99k £3.08k £3.17k £2.91k £1.96k
Total expenditure £5.51k £2.97k £2.51k £1.76k £1.11k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A