ACTION ON PAIN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide support and advice for people affected by chronic pain across the U.K and the rest of Europe. We operate "PainLine" our dedicated telephone helpine manned by experienced volunteers. We operate a Mobile Information Unit which visits locations across the U.K where we are able to provide "face to face" confidential advice and support. We lobby hard to improve pain services within the U.K.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ireland
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 08 October 2001: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicole Robinson-Ford | Trustee | 02 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
JUDITH MARY SEMMONS | Trustee | 12 March 2004 |
|
|
||||
Ian Semmons | Trustee | 09 September 2001 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.99k | £3.08k | £3.17k | £2.91k | £1.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.51k | £2.97k | £2.51k | £1.76k | £1.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 04 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 04 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 06 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 04 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28 AUGUST 2001
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE SUPPORT FOR PEOPLE AFFECTED BY CHRONIC PAIN; THEIR CARERS AND RELATIVES. TO CREATE A NATIONAL NETWORK OF SELF-HELP GROUPS AND BRANCHES FOR THOSE AFFECTED BY CHRONIC PAIN.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Mill Close
Terrington St. Clement
KING'S LYNN
Norfolk
PE34 4JG
- Phone:
- 01553828926
- Email:
- aopisat@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window