WARLEY WOODS COMMUNITY TRUST LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To ensure the long-term restoration and sustainability of Warley Woods Park, and to develop its facilities and events as a central focus for the local community, thus encouraging greater numbers and diversity of people to enjoy this unique environment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £72,488 from 1 government grant(s)
People

12 Trustee(s)
300 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Birmingham City
- Sandwell
Governance
- 02 July 2002: Standard registration
- WARLEY WOODS COMMUNITY TRUST (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STEVEN CHARLES ELING | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Dr Emma Louise Login | Trustee | 14 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lynda Tracy Wagstaff | Trustee | 16 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Paul Newman | Trustee | 17 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Michael James Talbot | Trustee | 26 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Neil Ashford | Trustee | 10 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
DAVID JOHN READ | Trustee | 10 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Ann Platts | Trustee | 29 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
ALAN DAVID REYNOLDS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ELIZABETH COLEMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ARTHUR ROBERT WARD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KATHERINE MARY SLADE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £446.20k | £468.42k | £470.70k | £442.60k | £489.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £340.35k | £303.68k | £384.83k | £467.84k | £482.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £72.49k | £146.81k | £72.49k | £72.49k | £72.49k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 04 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 04 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 11 MAY 2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 14 MAY 2002 as amended on 01 Feb 2020
Charitable objects
A) TO PROMOTE THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL, NATURAL AND HISTORIC ENVIRONMENT OF THE AREA KNOWN AS WARLEY WOODS. B)THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE OR THOSE WHO BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES, HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE. C) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR STUDYING THE HISTORICAL, ARCHAEOLOGICAL ENVIRONMENTAL AND HORTICULTURAL IMPORTANCE OF THE AREA KNOWN AS WARLEY WOODS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE PAVILION
101 LIGHTWOODS HILL
SMETHWICK
WEST MIDLANDS
B67 5ED
- Phone:
- 01214201061
- Email:
- admin@warleywoods.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window