THE FOUR SEASONS TRUST LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To relieve people with learning difficulties, including those with epilepsy, through the provision of residential care and homes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
Total income includes £396,760 from 3 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Surrey
Governance
- 30 August 2002: Standard registration
- THE FOUR SEASONS TRUST (Working name)
- Care Quality Commission
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Terry Newman | Trustee | 10 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
GEORGINA ROSEMARY PENROSE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID PHILIP JAMES AGGETT | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £181.25k | £182.55k | £173.00k | £318.14k | £396.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £222.65k | £214.50k | £167.69k | £232.94k | £304.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £180.68k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £180.24k | N/A | £173.00k | £318.14k | £396.76k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 09 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 09 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 27 May 2024 | 112 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 27 May 2024 | 112 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 02 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 02 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 1ST MARCH 2001 AND AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 6TH AUGUST 2002 AND 15 MARCH 2005
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PEOPLE WITH LEARNING DIFFICULTIES, INCLUDING THOSE WITH EPILEPSY, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF RESIDENTIAL CARE AND HOMES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
FOUR SEASONS
32 ABBOTSWOOD
GUILDFORD
GU1 1UZ
- Phone:
- 01483566056
- Email:
- abbotswood32@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window