TINTAGEL MEMORIAL PLAYING FIELDS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To maintain Childrens play area games wall and skate park. And to oversee the sports facilities for cricket, football and tennis. Plus the cricket pavilion of which we are landlord.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 12 March 2024
Total income includes £18,146 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cornwall
Governance
- 04 October 2001: Standard registration
- TINTAGEL MEMORIAL PLAYING FIELDS ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- TINTAGEL PLAYING FIELD & RECREATION GROUND (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jayne Mann | Trustee | 16 April 2024 |
|
|||||
Allan Sargeant | Trustee | 12 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Lane | Trustee | 06 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
GRAYBURN OWEN | Trustee | 30 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
MR PHIL HARTLEY | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 12/03/2020 | 12/03/2021 | 12/03/2022 | 12/03/2023 | 12/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.29k | £10.41k | £2.42k | £40.41k | £18.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.63k | £1.75k | £125 | £5.70k | £22.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £18.15k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 12 March 2024 | 08 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 12 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 12 March 2023 | 27 January 2024 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 12 March 2023 | 27 January 2024 | 15 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 12 March 2022 | 21 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 12 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 12 March 2021 | 30 March 2022 | 77 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 12 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 12 March 2020 | 05 February 2021 | 24 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 12 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCES DATED 20 DECEMBER 1946 AND 19 SEPTEMBER 1947
Charitable objects
A RECREATION AND PLAYING FIELD.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE TINTAGEL PLAYING FIELD AND RECREATION GROUND
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 LAURA CLOSE
TINTAGEL
PL34 0EB
- Phone:
- 01840770258
- Email:
- keenanguy@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window