Accounts and annual returns CHILDREN OF FIRE INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1088785
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 07 April 2024 29 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 07 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 07 April 2023 19 June 2024 133 days late
Accounts and TAR 07 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 07 April 2022 17 March 2023 38 days late
Accounts and TAR 07 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 07 April 2021 04 March 2022 25 days late
Accounts and TAR 07 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 07 April 2020 09 March 2021 30 days late
Accounts and TAR 07 April 2020 Not Required