YORKSHIRE MULTIPLES GROUP
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a support network for parents, carers and professionals of twins, triplets and more. We provide information, advice and support from literature, website, specialist toddler groups.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2016
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- City Of Wakefield
- Leeds City
Governance
- 04 March 2002: Standard registration
- 24 September 2017: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- YMG (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.28k | £521 | £400 | £731 | £608 | |
|
Total expenditure | £753 | £716 | £486 | £1.16k | £198 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 05 May 2017 | 94 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 21 April 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 22 January 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 JANUARY 2001 AS AMENDED 16 NOVEMBER 2001, 4 FEBRUARY 2002 AND 1ST APRIL 2005
Charitable objects
A) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC INCLUDING PERSONS ENGAGED IN MEDICAL, EDUCATIONAL OR WELFARE PROFESSIONS, ABOUT THE INCIDENCE AND AFFECTS OF MULTIPLE BIRTHS AND, IN PARTICULAR, TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION ABOUT ALL ASPECTS OF THE CARE, WELFARE AND DEVELOPMENT OF TWINS AND HIGHER MULTIPLES; B) TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT HEALTH (BOTH PHYSICAL AND PSYCHOLOGICAL) OF THE PARENTS AND CARERS OF TWINS, WITH SPECIAL REGARD TO THE HEALTH OF THE WOMEN WHO ARE EXPERIENCING MULTIPLE BIRTHS OR WHO HAVE GIVEN BIRTH TO TWINS OR HIGHER MULTIPLES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window