OAKLEY HOLIDAYS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Residential activity holidays for young people
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

14 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 12 August 2002: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID GUY DERBYSHIRE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Beverley Ann Kent | Trustee | 11 November 2017 |
|
|||||
THOMAS OLIVER COUSINS | Trustee | 11 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
NINA HELEN WALKER | Trustee | 11 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Ann Whitmore | Trustee | 11 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Felicity Helen Troughton | Trustee | 11 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Christopher John Troughton | Trustee | 11 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
HELENA DERBYSHIRE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RUSSEL BAILEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CAROLINE HARRIET DERBYSHIRE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr VICTORIA THOMAS | Trustee |
|
||||||
KATHERINE LOUISE JOYCE SEALY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PHILIP JULIAN WILDE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JENNIFER MARY BEAKE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £52.26k | £4.18k | £2.69k | £45.90k | £67.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £51.77k | £1.88k | £1.11k | £39.67k | £60.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 24 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 04 July 2021 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 17 November 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 17 November 2019 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 16 JULY 2002 as amended on 31 Mar 2024
Charitable objects
The Charity’s objects are to benefit children aged 11-18 and young adults aged 18-23 through their leisure time activities, predominantly through the provision of holidays, so as to develop their physical, mental and spiritual wellbeing so that they may grow to full maturity as individuals and members of society.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 BELLINGHAM ROAD
LYTHAM ST. ANNES
FY8 4JQ
- Phone:
- 01253731040
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window