SHOPMOBILITY ASHFORD (KENT)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide mobility for all people with mobility problems. All people wanting help with mobility, with increasing usage, being very user friendly.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2008
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Other Charitable Purposes
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Kent
Governance
- 12 December 2001: Standard registration
- 04 February 2011: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | 31/12/2007 | 31/12/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.46k | £23.53k | £19.49k | £11.12k | £18.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.84k | £20.75k | £19.49k | £10.76k | £18.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2008 | 24 April 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2008 | 23 October 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2007 | 04 April 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 23 October 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | 23 October 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 29 June 2006 | 149 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | 29 June 2006 | 149 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 23 JULY, 2001 AND AMENDED ON 15 OCTOBER, 2001.
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE DISABLED PERSONS AND OTHERS WITH IMPAIRED OR LIMITED MOBILITY IN ASHFORD, KENT, BY THE PROVISION OF LOANED ELECTRIC AND POWERED WHEELCHAIRS AND SCOOTERS TO ENABLE SUCH PERSONS TO HAVE ACCESS TO SHOPS AND OTHER SERVICES AND FACILITIES IN THE LOCALITY.
Area of benefit
ASHFORD, KENT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window