THE LANGHAM PARTNERSHIP (UK AND IRELAND)

Charity Number: 1092233
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Christian leadership training through PhD scholarships, literature resources and publisher development and preaching training.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Albania
  • Argentina
  • Bangladesh
  • Belarus
  • Benin
  • Bolivia
  • Bosnia And Herzegovina
  • Brazil
  • Bulgaria
  • Burkina Faso
  • Burma
  • Burundi
  • Cambodia
  • Cameroon
  • Central African Republic
  • Chad
  • Chile
  • China
  • Colombia
  • Congo
  • Congo (Democratic Republic)
  • Costa Rica
  • Croatia
  • Czech Republic
  • Ecuador
  • Egypt
  • El Salvador
  • Estonia
  • Ethiopia
  • France
  • Ghana
  • Greece
  • Guyana
  • India
  • Indonesia
  • Ivory Coast
  • Jamaica
  • Kenya
  • Kyrgyzstan
  • Laos
  • Lebanon
  • Lesotho
  • Liberia
  • Macedonia
  • Madagascar
  • Malawi
  • Mongolia
  • Nigeria
  • Pakistan
  • Panama
  • Papua New Guinea
  • Paraguay
  • Peru
  • Philippines
  • Romania
  • Russia
  • Rwanda
  • Serbia
  • Sierra Leone
  • Solomon Islands
  • South Africa
  • South Sudan
  • Spain
  • Sri Lanka
  • Sudan
  • Tanzania
  • Thailand
  • Togo
  • Trinidad And Tobago
  • Turkey
  • Uganda
  • Ukraine
  • Vanuatu
  • Vietnam
  • Zambia
  • Zimbabwe

Governance

Registration history:
  • 28 May 2002: Standard registration
  • 11 July 2023: Funds received from 226084 ALUM ROCK HALL TRUST
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MARY EVANS Chair 04 April 2011
THE ETHIOPIAN GRADUATE SCHOOL OF THEOLOGY TRUST
Received: On time
Dr David Benson Trustee 08 November 2023
None on record
Nigel Anketell Trustee 16 June 2023
None on record
Nigel Paul Bridges Trustee 05 June 2021
THE CHRIST CHURCH GOSPEL PARTNERS' FUND
Received: On time
CHRIST CHURCH SOUTHAMPTON CIO
Received: On time
Desta Heliso Anshebo Trustee 10 December 2020
None on record
ALAN JOHNSTON Trustee 01 May 2019
None on record
Stephen Osei-Mensah Trustee 22 April 2013
MISSION AVIATION FELLOWSHIP INTERNATIONAL
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £3.39m £3.86m £3.75m £4.91m £5.08m
Total expenditure £3.34m £3.34m £4.04m £4.92m £4.75m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £13.00k £5.21k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £2.96m £3.43m £3.20m £4.48m £4.63m
Income - Other trading activities £277.35k £0 £413.13k £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £126.57k £412.83k £120.75k £417.00k £452.74k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £15.34k £11.65k £10.47k £13.50k £3.76k
Income - Other £13.00k £5.21k £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £49.74k £454.65k £11.32k £490.88k £445.02k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.14m £3.16m £3.84m £4.59m £4.46m
Expenditure - Raising funds £198.99k £184.92k £203.12k £327.09k £290.55k
Expenditure - Governance £127.51k £28.48k £76.09k £159.72k £101.70k
Expenditure - Grants institution £983.24k £457.30k £465.08k £724.07k £293.82k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Own use assets £952.50k £1.89m £2.31m £2.28m £2.24m
Long-term investments £389.82k £402.56k £364.33k £114.42k £121.39k
Other assets £1.04m £961.59k £706.99k £1.03m £1.54m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £187.67k £537.07k £990.29k £1.06m £1.21m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 29 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 29 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2023 29 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 29 April 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 04 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 04 April 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 11 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 11 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 11 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 11 March 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Langham Partnership
Lancaster Street
CARLISLE
CA1 1TF
Phone:
07816065518