THE HANWORTH AND FELTHAM PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
An educational and social work charity with additional youth remit working in a disadvantaged areas. Provision of equipment & furniture to local day nursery; ad hoc literacy support but regular sessions have not proved possible; consortium with other charities in area to provide a Summer Project, which assisted St George's (Hanworth) Youth Club to run two activity weeks for local youngsters.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Hounslow
Governance
- 28 February 2002: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Paul Stewart Williamson | Chair |
|
||||||||||||
David Kenton Dermondy | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|||||||||||
John Thomas Bannon | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|||||||||||
Dr Stephen Peter Fry | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|||||||||||
Alison Menage | Trustee | 02 January 2020 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.35k | £2.20k | £2.66k | £1.50k | £200 | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.11k | £2.00k | £2.23k | £1.24k | £1.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 07 November 2020 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST EXECUTED ON THE 24TH JANUARY 2002.
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE TRUST FUND AND ITS INCOME UPON TRUST TO APPLY THEM FOR THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") IN HANWORTH, FELTHAM & ADJACENT AREA ("THE AREA OF BENEFIT") 1. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING A STUDY SUPPORT CENTRE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE UNDER THE AGE OF 18; NURSERY PROVISION FOR PRE-SCHOOL AGE CHILDREN; AND IT TUITION FOR ADULTS. 2. TO RELIEVE POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING COUNSELLING AND ADVICE AND OTHER SUPPORT SERVICES FROM APPROPRIATELY QUALIFIED PERSONS TO FAMILIES WHO ARE IN CHARITABLE NEED. 3. FOR THE BENEFIT OF YOUNG PEOPLE UNDER THE AGE OF 25, TO PROVIDE AND ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND SO THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED; IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF ACTIVITIES, CLUBS, OUTINGS, CRAFTWORK AND DUKE OF EDINBURGH AWARD SCHEME.
Area of benefit
SURREY & MIDDLESEX
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 Blakewood Close
Feltham
TW13 7NL
- Phone:
- 02088440457
- Email:
- 1STEWART1@LIVE.CO.UK
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window