FAMILIES FOR CHILDREN TRUST

Charity number: 1093131
Charity is insolvent

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Voluntary Adoption Agency placing children from all over the UK with families in Cornwall, Devon, Dorset and Somerset.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2020

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

This charity raises funds from the public but does not work with professional fundraisers or commercial participators.

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Cornwall
  • Devon
  • Dorset
  • Plymouth City
  • Somerset
  • Torbay

Governance

Registration history:
  • 25 July 2002: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • FAMILIES FOR CHILDREN (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Nicholas Timothy Allan Chair 05 July 2019
THE QUEEN ANNE'S GATE FOUNDATION
Received: On time
NATIONAL OPERA STUDIO
Received: On time
THE GRANGE FESTIVAL
Received: On time
Tina Gail Cook Trustee 30 July 2021
None on record
Dr Susan Howson Trustee 20 July 2020
None on record
Jacqueline Kay Saunders Trustee 01 November 2019
None on record
Dr Louisiana Lush PhD Trustee 13 July 2018
Dialogue Earth
Received: On time
Susan Phyllis Lucas Trustee 29 January 2016
None on record
Charmian O'Kelly Trustee 23 January 2015
None on record
Roger Lake Trustee 31 March 2014
None on record
TERENCE WILLIAM CONNOR Trustee 26 March 2012
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £1.66m £1.89m £1.62m £1.55m £1.33m
Total expenditure £1.65m £1.79m £1.75m £1.73m £1.28m
Income from government contracts £164.00k £112.93k £94.61k £100.36k £86.36k
Income from government grants £63.80k £329.77k £97.38k N/A £67.78k
Income - Donations and legacies £268.14k £284.57k £309.31k £229.61k £399.06k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.37m £1.60m £1.29m £1.30m £833.12k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £9.24k £8.85k £8.28k £9.72k £6.78k
Income - Other £11.71k £8.50k £10.24k £11.28k £90.98k
Income - Legacies £0 £3.50k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.62m £1.74m £1.70m £1.68m £1.25m
Expenditure - Raising funds £36.10k £48.73k £56.62k £51.08k £28.51k
Expenditure - Governance £10.56k £13.28k £8.79k £9.16k £9.19k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Own use assets £9.28k £4.54k £3.51k £5.52k £3.36k
Long-term investments £448.38k £490.90k £481.35k £569.51k £499.58k
Other assets £578.32k £788.40k £775.18k £555.93k £739.23k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £142.47k £242.33k £367.21k £336.61k £347.64k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024
Annual return 30 June 2023
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023
Annual return 30 June 2022
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022
Annual return 31 December 2020
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020
Annual return 31 December 2019
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Families for Children
Higher Mill
Buckfast
Buckfastleigh
TQ11 0EE
Phone:
01364645480