EPIC ARTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
EPIC ARTS IS AN INCLUSIVE ORGANISATION THAT RUNS ARTS AND EDUCATIONAL PROGRAMMES FOR DISABLED AND DISADVANTAGED CHILDREN AND YOUNG ADULTS IN CAMBODIA. IT ALSO DEVELOPS AND RUNS INCLUSIVE AND SUSTAINABLE SOCIAL ENTERPRISES.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Cambodia
Governance
- 12 March 2002: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dermot Trimble | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Alexandra Kate Goad | Trustee | 08 December 2022 |
|
|||||
Gouri Kubair | Trustee | 01 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lavinia Davolio | Trustee | 18 October 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £425.47k | £198.54k | £147.03k | £280.66k | £375.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £279.14k | £230.59k | £205.76k | £315.48k | £403.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 07 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 07 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 11 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 13 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON THE 20TH AUGUST 2001 AS AMENDED BY A SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 28TH FEBRUARY 2002.
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE COMPANY IS ESTABLISHED (THE "OBJECTS") ARE:- 1. TO PROMOTE EDUCATION AND IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) IN ART AND DRAMA; AND 2. TO RELIEVE AND BENEFIT THOSE SUFFERING FROM A PHYSICAL OR MENTAL DISABILITY; AND "PROVIDED ALWAYS THAT IN FURTHERING THESE OBJECTS THE CHARITY SHALL HAVE REGARD TO THE TENETS OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH."
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
17 CARMICHAEL MEWS
LONDON
SW18 3HH
- Phone:
- +855 33 555 5201
- Email:
- info@epicarts.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window