THE MAY GIBSON CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity number: 1089534
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support for charities & charitable activities. The Charity ceased operations on 27 June 2023
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 28 July 2022
Total income: £3,181
Total expenditure: £60,511
Fundraising
No information available
Trading
No information available
Trustee payments
No information available
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
- Windsor And Maidenhead
- Throughout London
- Ireland
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
Registration history:
- 28 November 2001: Standard registration
- 19 July 2023: Removed (Does not operate)
- 19 July 2023: Funds transferred to 287598 THE BRITISH DRUZE SOCIETY
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
No other names
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
- Investment
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 28/07/2018 | 28/07/2019 | 28/07/2020 | 28/07/2021 | 28/07/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.49k | £10.04k | £7.21k | £4.29k | £3.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.15k | £90.15k | £92.29k | £45.64k | £60.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 28 July 2022 | 14 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 July 2021 | 18 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 July 2020 | 23 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 July 2019 | 13 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 30TH AUGUST 2001
Charitable objects
SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window