MAY ERSKINE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Small grants given at the discretion of trustees - mainly by standing order/direct debit to charities supported by the trustees
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 08 February 2002: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Simon David ERSKINE FCA FCIE | Trustee | 04 September 1995 |
|
|
||||
Dr May Khin Erskine FRCOG FFFP | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.09k | £5.08k | £5.07k | £141 | £5.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.93k | £4.18k | £4.98k | £4.18k | £5.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 27 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 26 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 12 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 28 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 12 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED MADE THE 4TH OF SEPTEMBER 1995.
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL SUBJECT TO THE PROVISIONS OF CLAUSE 12 HEREOF STAND POSSESSED OF THE TRUST FUND UPON THE TRUSTS AND SUBJECT TO THE POWERS AND PROVISIONS FOLLOWING THAT IS TO SAY: 1. DURING THE LIFE OF THE SETTLOR UPON TRUST TO PAY OR APPLY THE WHOLE OR ANY PART OF THE ACCUMULATED INCOME OF THE TRUST FUND AND ALSO SO MUCH OF THE CAPITAL OF THE TRUST FUND AS THE SETTLOR MAY DETERMINE FROM TIME TO TIME BY NOTICE IN WRITING SIGNED BY HER TO THE TRUSTEES TO SUCH ONE OR MORE CHARITIES AND/OR TO SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AND IN SUCH PROPORTIONS AND IN SUCH MANNER AND SUBJECT TO SUCH TERMS AND CONDITIONS AS THE SETTLOR MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BY LIKE NOTICE DIRECT AND SUBJECT TO AND IN DEFAULT OF ANY SUCH DIRECTION OR INSOFAR AS SUCH DIRECTION MAY NOT EXTEND TO ALL THE ACCUMULATED INCOME AVAILABLE AT THE END OF ANY FINANCIAL YEAR THEN AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN RESPECT OF SUCH INCOME IN THEIR UNCONTROLLED DISCRETION DETERMINE. 2. AFTER THE DEATH OF THE SETTLOR UPON TRUST TO PAY OR APPLY THE CAPITAL AND INCOME OF THE TRUST FUND TO SUCH CHARITIES AND/OR TO SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AND IN SUCH PROPORTIONS IN SUCH MANNER AND SUBJECT TO SUCH TERMS AND CONDITIONS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR UNCONTROLLED DISCRETION DETERMINE HAVING REGARD TO ANY DIRECTIONS GIVEN OR WISHES EXPRESSED BY THE SETTLOR TO THE TRUSTEES WHETHER INTER VIVOS OR BY WILL.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
61 MORTIMER ROAD
LONDON
NW10 5QR
- Phone:
- 02089640198
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window