CROOK FOR CHERNOBYL CHILDREN
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Activities ceased
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 19 October 2011
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Durham
Governance
- 29 January 2003: Standard registration
- 30 October 2012: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/12/2007 | 30/12/2008 | 30/12/2009 | 30/12/2010 | 19/10/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.78k | £34.24k | £39.94k | £33.23k | £187 | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.47k | £17.11k | £29.27k | £19.80k | £80.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 19 October 2011 | 02 October 2012 | 44 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 19 October 2011 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 December 2010 | 30 November 2011 | 31 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 December 2010 | 30 November 2011 | 31 days late | |
Annual return | 30 December 2009 | 10 November 2010 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 December 2009 | 10 November 2010 | 11 days late | |
Annual return | 30 December 2008 | 27 October 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 December 2008 | 23 October 2009 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 0N 6 FEBRUARY 2001 AS AMENDED 17 DECEMBER 2002.
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS PARTICULARLY AMONGST CHILDREN LIVING IN UKRAINE AFFECTED BY THE CHERNOBYL DISASTER BY THE PROVISION OF HUMANITARIAN AID AND RECUPERATIVE HOLIDAYS WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
UKRAINE.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window