Financial history FIRST LIGHT SOUTH WEST LTD

Charity number: 1090457
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £2.64m £3.36m £4.19m £4.80m £5.32m
Total expenditure £2.40m £2.67m £3.53m £4.61m £5.61m
Income from government contracts £2.21m N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £319.45k £3.01m £3.89m £4.31m £4.83m
Income - Donations and legacies £2.64m £3.35m £4.19m £4.79m £5.28m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £4.82k £7.35k £400 £1.60k £5.23k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £263 £70 £46 £5.53k £32.06k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.40m £2.67m £3.48m £4.56m £5.53m
Expenditure - Raising funds £4.81k £0 £44.70k £50.91k £84.67k
Expenditure - Governance £14.49k £15.74k £19.88k £12.28k £35.87k
Expenditure - Grants institution £15.00k £504.61k £792.81k £924.26k £739.66k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0