FRIENDS OF STRATFORD SUB CASTLE PRIMARY SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To raise money in support of the education of the children at Stratford-Sub-Castle School.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
22 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 25 April 2002: Standard registration
- FRIENDS OF STRAFFORD SUB CASTLE PRIMARY SCHOOL (Previous name)
- STRATFORD-SUB-CASTLE SCHOOL PTA (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sharlene Lucas | Chair | 01 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Ewing | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Vigor | Trustee | 17 October 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.90k | £11.14k | £5.59k | £10.80k | £14.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.45k | £13.66k | £8.49k | £5.66k | £11.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 15 July 2024 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 15 July 2024 | 381 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 17 July 2020 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 4 FEBRUARY 2002 AS AMENDED ON 16 OCT 2017
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY 1. DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN STAFF PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; 2. ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS;
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE STRATFORD-SUB-CASTLE C OF E VC SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Stratford Sub Castle C Of E School
Stratford Road
Stratford Sub Castle
SALISBURY
Wiltshire
SP1 3LL
- Phone:
- 01722712229
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window